Financial history HALIFAX MEETING HOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 1026159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.07k £7.67k £8.09k £6.37k £7.03k
Total expenditure £3.45k £6.22k £10.52k £1.75k £6.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A