WILTSHIRE MUSIC CENTRE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1026160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late Download