WILTSHIRE MUSIC CENTRE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1026160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN CROSS Trustee 09 January 2012 None on record
JAMES ANTHONY IGNATIUS WETZ Trustee 04 November 2016 None on record
Emily Rachel Pieczko Trustee 30 November 2018 None on record
DAVID RICHARDSON Trustee 24 October 2014 None on record
ANNE MILLMAN Trustee 24 October 2014
THE OXFORD SCHOOL OF DRAMA TRUST Received: On time
JONATHAN BERRIDGE Trustee 24 October 2014 None on record
Mark Anthony Lee Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
Alexander Paul Segrave Trustee 04 December 2020 None on record
HARRIET FEILDING Trustee 30 January 2015
THE TRUSTEES OF THE SAXON CHURCH Received: On time
ALAN MACRAE Trustee 04 November 2016
WILTSHIRE RURAL MUSIC SCHOOL LIMITED Received: 110 days late
Ian Leslie Thorn Trustee 04 November 2016
Friends of The Marden Valley
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST Received: On time
WILTSHIRE RURAL MUSIC SCHOOL LIMITED Received: 110 days late
Miranda Kate Houghton Trustee 04 December 2020
THE SERSE TRUST Received: On time
MATTHEW CLEAVER Trustee 24 October 2014
PAVILION DANCE SOUTH WEST LIMITED Received: On time
MUSIC BEYOND MAINSTREAM LTD Received: On time
Emma Diana Sandberg Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record