CHISENHALE GALLERY

Charity number: 1026175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £497.56k £537.13k £642.58k £745.35k £666.12k
Total expenditure £516.92k £528.60k £622.53k £649.36k £681.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £165.38k £165.38k £176.18k £165.38k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £276.04k £574.43k £547.71k £505.35k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £260.93k £68.05k £168.81k £124.33k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £162 £103 £153 £231
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £28.69k £36.21k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £528.60k £622.53k £649.36k £681.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £21.72k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0