CHISENHALE GALLERY

Charity number: 1026175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Marten Trustee 28 January 2015 None on record
ANDREW HALE Trustee 03 January 2013 None on record
May Calil Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
Shane Akeroyd Trustee 10 February 2016 None on record
Paul Maheke Trustee 05 November 2018 None on record
Samuel John Talbot Trustee 06 February 2019 None on record
ANDREW HAIGH Trustee
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF MUSIC Received: On time
ALICE RAWSTHORN Chair 14 August 2012
THE HEPWORTH WAKEFIELD Received: On time
Mark Godfrey Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Sasha Morgan Trustee 18 August 2021
BOLD EVERYWHERE Received: On time
KEIR MCGUINNESS Trustee 31 October 2013
ART360 FOUNDATION Received: On time
MARIE-LOUISE VON MOTESICZKY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time