FRIENDS OF GUNTHORPE PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1026314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required