FRIENDS OF GUNTHORPE PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1026314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £5.37k £5.21k £3.00k £20.35k £5.91k
Total expenditure £2.63k £1.29k £455 £1.66k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A