THE JULIA MARGARET CAMERON TRUST

Charity number: 1026339
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 January 2019 24 December 2019 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 24 December 2019 24 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 23 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 23 August 2016 On time Download