FRANCIS BAILY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required