FRANCIS BAILY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £18.16k £20.00k £18.56k £33.50k £34.46k
Total expenditure £15.19k £14.02k £24.16k £34.38k £24.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A