SOCIETY FOR NAUTICAL RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society's core activities are to support and publish research into maritime areas by means of inter alia producing The Mariner's Mirror; supporting conferences; making an award for the best book published on maritime history in the previous year, delivering an annual lecture; developing the Society's website and administering the Save The Victory Fund and the Macpherson Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alison Averil Telfer | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Captain Peter Henry King | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Elisabeth Cecilia Scheybeler | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Joseph Heaslip | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Ball | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John David Davies | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Derek Victor Nudd | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Cunliffe | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Alfred Barton | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Claire Elaine Jowitt | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Hannah Melissa Stockton | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Brandon | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Bugden | Trustee | 13 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.19k | £198.27k | £305.42k | £218.86k | £238.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £534.73k | £119.28k | £228.50k | £294.12k | £135.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/08/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2013 as amended on 12 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO NAUTICAL ANTIQUITIES, INTO MATTERS RELATING TO SEAFARING AND SHIPBUILDING IN ALL AGES AND AMONG ALL NATIONS, INTO THE LANGUAGE AND CUSTOMS OF THE SEA AND INTO OTHER SUBJECTS OF NAUTICAL INTEREST, TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND OTHERWISE ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUCH SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOORE KINGSTON SMITH & PARTNERS LTD
9 APPOLD STREET
LONDON
EC2A 2AP
- Phone:
- 02075664000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window