ROTARY CLUB OF PICKERING AND DISTRICT TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing human and financial assistance to charitable needs locally, nationally and internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Stephen Flintoft | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Baxter | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Monaghan | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.09k | £4.88k | £18.41k | £21.17k | £69.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.89k | £4.19k | £16.53k | £22.19k | £21.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION OR SOCIETY OR OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orchard Dene
Hutton-Le-Hole
YORK
YO62 6UD
- Phone:
- 01751411964
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window