Trustees MEDECINS SANS FRONTIERES (UK)

Charity number: 1026588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Innocent Muleya Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
Emery Igiraneza Trustee 20 May 2022
None on record
Sophie Roberta Hodder Trustee 30 July 2021
None on record
Dr Mohammed Tariq Ali Trustee 12 June 2021
None on record
Dr Eve Esther Bruce Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Dr Rachael Mary Craven Trustee 13 June 2020
None on record
Samuel Turner Trustee 13 June 2020
None on record
Christopher Peskett Trustee 13 June 2020
None on record
Vita Sanderson Trustee 09 June 2019
None on record
Dr Robert Verrecchia Trustee 09 June 2019
None on record
Derek Morgan Trustee 24 May 2019
None on record
Nicola Mclean Trustee 19 May 2018
None on record