Accounts and annual returns INNER WHEEL CLUB OF DONCASTER ST LEGER BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1026608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required