Financial history INNER WHEEL CLUB OF DONCASTER ST LEGER BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1026608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £5.27k £3.93k £3.81k £4.59k £6.18k
Total expenditure £5.14k £4.22k £3.80k £4.36k £6.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A