Trustees COATHAM HOUSE

Charity number: 1026620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gursharan Singh Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Amanda McWilliams Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Denise Moon Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
David Eagle Trustee 02 May 2019
AGE UK TEESSIDE
Received: On time
EAST CLEVELAND YOUTH HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
Andrew Pettersen Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
DAVID ROBERT STONES Trustee 11 January 2017
CLEVELAND CONCERT BAND
Overdue by 556 days
Valerie Yare Trustee 06 July 2016
None on record