NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR THE TRAINING OF JOURNALISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the Charity are the provision, supervision and accreditation of journalism-related training, and the directors intend to continue to develop these activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,959,906
Donations and legacies | £437.48k | |
Charitable activities | £1.28m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £132.19k | |
Other | £114.59k |
Total expenditure:
£2,534,064
Raising funds | £26.98k | |
Charitable activities | £2.51m | |
Other | £0 |
£97,155 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £26.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.51m |
People

21 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
333 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 September 1993: Standard registration
- NCTJ (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John McAndrew | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Martin | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Kan-Dapaah | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brooks | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sinker | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alford | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Alison Johnson | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edmunds | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Patrick O'Brien | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Webster | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Toby Leon Granville | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wright | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAMILTON RYLEY | Trustee | 20 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34m | £3.86m | £7.69m | £1.89m | £1.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.38m | £3.14m | £8.16m | £2.19m | £2.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £431.81k | £2.73m | £6.56m | £530.78k | £437.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £848.92k | £1.04m | £1.01m | £1.08m | £1.28m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £29.97k | £19.39k | £37.12k | £126.50k | £132.19k | |
|
Income - Other | £24.49k | £69.21k | £83.12k | £146.31k | £114.59k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.37m | £3.12m | £8.13m | £2.17m | £2.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £11.46k | £20.82k | £26.30k | £23.60k | £26.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.96k | £12.88k | £16.63k | £20.58k | £20.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.91m | £1.40m | £6.40m | £199.56k | £373.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.85k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £401.45k | £422.16k | £429.05k | £391.40k | £387.27k | |
|
Long-term investments | £866.64k | £1.09m | £914.97k | £964.92k | £1.04m | |
|
Other assets | £2.57m | £3.44m | £7.58m | £4.63m | £2.69m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £223.88k | £400.05k | £5.01m | £2.34m | £946.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 7 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 11 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF TRAINEE JOURNALISTS INCLUDING PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW GRANARY
STATION ROAD
NEWPORT
SAFFRON WALDEN
ESSEX
CB11 3PL
- Phone:
- 01799544014
- Email:
- joanne.forbes@nctj.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window