WESTWICK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1026707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 17 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 21 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required