WESTWICK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1026707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £5.73k £7.01k £5.43k £4.83k £7.55k
Total expenditure £5.59k £6.97k £5.44k £4.51k £7.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A