Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREW'S PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 19 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 03 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 24 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 04 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window