Trustees ST ANDREW'S PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREA POWELL Chair 05 July 2012
None on record
Matthew Johnson Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Amy Monaghan Trustee 18 January 2022
None on record
Amy Binney Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
Alison Parker Trustee 14 March 2016
None on record