Accounts and annual returns 21 CLUB LUTON

Charity number: 1026900
Charity reporting is overdue by 125 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required