MANOR FARM PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sessional pre-school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 October 1993: Standard registration
- MANOR FARM PRE-SCHOOL/NURSERY EDUCATION (Working name)
- MANOR FARM SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Ashton | Chair | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Woodbridge | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Matthams | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Philpin | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Barnes | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Burnage | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bowles | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Haymes | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.43k | £192.15k | £150.22k | £158.17k | £167.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.92k | £185.95k | £156.25k | £179.54k | £177.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £115.84k | £113.86k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 July 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 July 2020 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1990 AND AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR FARM PRE SCHOOL
ROSE AVENUE
HAZLEMERE
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP15 7PH
- Phone:
- 01494816730
- Email:
- mfps.office@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window