CHISWICK PIER TRUST

Charity number: 1026957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 March 2017 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 22 February 2017 17 days late Download