Financial history PORT OF TILBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1026959
Charity reporting is overdue by 242 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.00k £2.00k £1.00k £1.00k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A