Financial history THE INSTITUTE FOR WAR AND PEACE REPORTING (IWPR)

Charity number: 1027201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.90m £5.86m £5.10m £4.96m £4.02m
Total expenditure £5.09m £5.82m £5.47m £4.95m £4.34m
Income from government contracts £903.94k £1.28m £982.60k £692.44k £635.59k
Income from government grants £2.17m £3.71m £2.03m £2.04m £1.09m
Income - Donations and legacies £103 £108.12k £796 £59.96k £30.10k
Income - Other trading activities £903.94k £0 £982.60k £692.44k £635.59k
Income - Charitable activities £3.52m £4.47m £4.11m £4.21m £3.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.47m £1.28m £10.82k £384 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.00m £4.61m £4.61m £4.30m £3.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £89.65k £71.64k £44.45k £47.47k £49.49k
Expenditure - Governance £19.80k £0 £0 £23.35k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.14m £821.17k £604.12k £572.11k