Accounts and annual returns ENFIELD SCHOOL OF LIFE SAVING

Charity number: 1027206
Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 226 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 226 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 November 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2020 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required Download Open in new window