Financial history ENFIELD SCHOOL OF LIFE SAVING

Charity number: 1027206
Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.34k £5.68k £6.91k £3.20k £4.05k
Total expenditure £8.85k £5.92k £7.33k £3.15k £2.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A