WEST LONDON CENTRE FOR COUNSELLING

Charity number: 1027290
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £433.66k £412.37k £385.91k £380.13k £387.05k
Total expenditure £414.50k £424.32k £431.40k £381.87k £387.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A £377.06k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A