BACUP FELLOWSHIP OF CHURCHES

Charity number: 1027345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £52.83k £52.30k £45.27k £69.89k £72.47k
Total expenditure £47.03k £51.56k £41.51k £60.07k £68.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £26.13k