BACUP FELLOWSHIP OF CHURCHES

Charity number: 1027345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DOREEN ELIZABETH WHITELEGG Trustee 04 August 2011 None on record
KAREN ROSEMARY SPENCER Trustee 04 August 2011 None on record
DOROTHY ALCOCK Trustee 27 September 2011 None on record
Veda Hitchen Trustee 24 February 2014 None on record
Rev DEREK ALLEN Chair 01 October 2018 None on record
Rev DAVID JOHN BURROW Trustee 27 February 2017
BOLTON AND ROCHDALE METHODIST DISTRICT Received: On time