BARDET - BIEDL SYNDROME UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ANNUAL FAMILY CONFERENCE, INCLUDING CHILDREN'S ACTIVITIES THROUGHOUT THE WEEKEND. PLUS PROFESSIONAL SPEAKERS, AND A CHANCE FOR FAMILIES AND THOSE WITH BBS TO GAIN INFORMATION AND SUPPORT THROUGHOUT THE WEEKEND AND THE YEAR. FUNDRAISING THROUGHTOUT THE YEAR. SUPPORTING FAMILIES AND THOSE WITH BBS WITH AN UP TO DATE WEB PAGE, PLUS INFORMATION LEAFLETS, NEWLETTERS, AND HELPLINE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 October 1993: Standard registration
- 23 December 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 23 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1181244 BARDET-BIEDL SYNDROME UK (BBS UK)
- BARDET-BIEDL SYNDROME UK (Working name)
- LMBBS (Working name)
- LAURENCE-MOON-BARDET-BIEDL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.80k | £63.94k | £51.22k | £97.95k | £101.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.31k | £30.81k | £40.24k | £63.30k | £104.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 04 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 04 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 17 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 17 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 12 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/08/1993 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2015
Charitable objects
A) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LAURENCE-MOON-BARDET-BIEDL SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL PROFESSIONS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF LAURENCE-MOON-BARDET-BIEDL SYNDROME AND ITS IMPLICATIONS FOR THE FAMILY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window