Accounts and annual returns PURBECK RADAR MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1027390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 January 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 March 2018 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required