WOW YOUTH MUSICAL THEATRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of young persons between 10 - 18 in dramatic and musical arts, and to donate funds, when considered possible, or practical, for charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 October 1993: Standard registration
- 09 April 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 April 2019: Funds transferred to 1176474 WOW YOUTH MUSICAL THEATRE
- WEYMOUTH OPERATIC WORKSHOP (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.46k | £103.15k | £87.31k | £82.86k | £82.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.03k | £87.89k | £69.85k | £78.76k | £87.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 15 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 13 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 AND 18 YEARS IN THE DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS AND TO DONATE FUNDS WHEN CONSIDERED POSSIBLE OR PRACTICAL FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window