FRIENDS OF ST. STEPHEN'S PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for St Stephens Church of England Junior School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 27 October 1993: Standard registration
- ST STEPHEN'S P T A (Working name)
- ST STEPHENS CHURCH OF ENGLAND JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ST STEPHENS CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Fortunati | Chair | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Alice George | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Baum | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Taylor-Judd | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.97k | £30.39k | £29.87k | £66.63k | £93.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.04k | £29.92k | £29.47k | £48.34k | £74.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 03/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2015 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TWICKENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winchester Road
TWICKENHAM
TW1 1LF
- Phone:
- 07939858939
- Email:
- fossps@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window