Financial history BLACK NOTLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1027564
Charity reporting is up to date (194 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £33.95k £26.49k £38.91k £36.19k £15.38k
Total expenditure £34.38k £33.93k £38.81k £38.25k £15.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A