Trustees 13TH LANCASTER SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1027684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Patricia Griffin | Chair | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Adey | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rubi Maybeth Garcia Almada | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bradshaw | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Armstrong | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Geddes | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Simon Hester | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Harling | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bleasdale | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Smith | Trustee | 28 February 2000 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN GREENE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.