Accounts and annual returns BEULAH YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1027708
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required