Accounts and annual returns KIRKBYMOORSIDE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1027784
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 03 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 29 January 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 April 2021 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 December 2020 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required