Financial history KIRKBYMOORSIDE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1027784
Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £10.03k £11.66k £8.81k £500 £5.96k
Total expenditure £7.66k £8.75k £9.32k £2.51k £4.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A