Financial history LI TIM OI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1027837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £982.00k £64.08k £42.93k £31.50k £36.35k
Total expenditure £31.12k £23.41k £94.81k £102.18k £197.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £981.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £207 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £73 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £50 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £963.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £1.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £29.55k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £416 N/A N/A N/A N/A