Trustees LI TIM OI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1027837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTINA HENKING MULLER REES Chair 06 June 2022
None on record
Jane Margaret Grenfell Trustee 09 March 2021
None on record
TARIRO JULIAN MATSVERU Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Anna Margaret Drew Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
Jane Basa Namurye Trustee 13 March 2018
None on record
The Very Revd Martyn William Percy Trustee 15 September 2015
OXFORD LITERARY AND DEBATING UNION CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time