CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY CAMBORNE-REDRUTH

Charity number: 1027841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £26.84k £8.32k £6.99k £6.99k £8.64k
Total expenditure £7.69k £8.66k £9.23k £9.23k £8.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A