Accounts and annual returns 7TH HUDDERSFIELD CLAYTON WEST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1027906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 May 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 March 2018 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required