SPARKLERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027960
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 11 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 09 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 09 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)