WESTBURY AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1028041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2019 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2017 Not Required