Financial history THE CHISLEHURST AND ST PAUL'S CRAY COMMONS CONSERVATORS

Charity number: 1028121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £101.87k £111.17k £116.42k £105.87k £115.94k
Total expenditure £99.35k £114.43k £104.93k £97.45k £114.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.31k £36.31k £36.31k £36.31k £36.31k