Trustees THE CHISLEHURST AND ST PAUL'S CRAY COMMONS CONSERVATORS

Charity number: 1028121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN HAYHOW Chair
None on record
Sarah Jane Fletcher Harris Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
Dr Brian Knights Trustee 12 November 2019
None on record
Joanna Dorothea Friel Trustee 18 March 2019
THE CHISLEHURST SOCIETY CIO
Received: On time
THE ASAMAA CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
Patrick Phillips Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
Robert West Trustee 07 March 2016
None on record
CHRISTINE WEARN Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
ALAN PORTER Trustee 06 February 2013
None on record
MARY WHEELER Trustee 06 February 2013
None on record
IAN LEONARD Trustee 31 October 2011
None on record
Peter HEDGES Trustee
None on record