ACORNS NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acorns Nursery School aims to provide a safe and happy environment in which children in the local community can play and learn from 2.5 years to 5 years old. As a member of the Pre-School Learning Alliance we aim to provide the highest quality of education and care while providing a positive and simulating experience for children, staff and parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £66,465 from 1 government contract(s) and £66,465 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caty Goodwin | Chair | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Attrill | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Ward | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.32k | £116.05k | £151.14k | £157.21k | £167.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.07k | £125.79k | £139.68k | £145.21k | £151.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £66.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £20.15k | £66.25k | £66.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 March 2023 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED 18 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SHACKLEFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shackleford Village Hall
Shackleford Road
Shackleford
GODALMING
Surrey
GU8 6AE
- Phone:
- 01483 860723
- Email:
- acornsoffice@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window