Trustees PROVINCIAL GRAND CHARITY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND HUNTINGDONSHIRE

Charity number: 1028243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Anthony Bennett Chair 23 May 2016
None on record
Timothy Joseph Almond Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Dr Kevin Rhydderch Williams Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Lt.Col Michael Charles Alexander Caseman-Jones Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Michael Warren Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
William Thomas Diggins Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
Kevin Charles Mackie Trustee 03 February 2020
None on record
Paul Anthony Sparks Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
GERARD THOMAS DEMPSEY Trustee 09 March 2019
THE 3 PILLARS - FEEDING THE HOMELESS
Received: On time
THE ACORN CANCER SUPPORT GROUP
Received: On time
Jonathon Richard Hedley Hibbins Trustee 10 March 2017
None on record
John Ernest Rivett Trustee 31 October 2016
None on record
Gerry Crawford Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record